+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
- Sent to the Governor
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services