+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 2, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 25, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 22, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
April 20, 2016: House Transportation & Energy: . .SB16-166
March 29, 2016: Senate Finance: . .SB16-166
March 29, 2016: Senate Finance: . .SB16-166
March 29, 2016: Senate Finance: . .SB16-166
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor