+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On May 27, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Postpone Indefinitely
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services