+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 9, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 29, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
+ − Votes (2)
April 26, 2016: House Judiciary: . .SB16-164
March 30, 2016: Senate Judiciary: . .SB16-164
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor