+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (14)
On July 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On June 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On June 19, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On June 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On June 12, 2020 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On June 11, 2020 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On June 10, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services
On June 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary