+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Rerevised w/ Amendments
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 02/12/2015 - No Amendments
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations