+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 6, 2024 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 16, 2024 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 16, 2024 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 16, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 8, 2024 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 7, 2024 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On April 14, 2024 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 12, 2024 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over to 04/14/2024 - No Amendments
On March 15, 2024 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 12, 2024 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 6, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
On March 4, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 1, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On February 28, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 15, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs