+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Appropriations
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 19, 2013: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-159 to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 13-0.
March 28, 2013: House Finance: FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-159 to the Committee on Appropriations. The motion passed on a vote of 12-0.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor