+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 2, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On April 25, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 22, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 19, 2016: House Public Health Care & Human Services: . .SB16-158
April 19, 2016: House Public Health Care & Human Services: . .SB16-158
March 30, 2016: Senate Health & Human Services: . .SB16-158
March 30, 2016: Senate Health & Human Services: . .SB16-158
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor