+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation & Energy Postpone Indefinitely
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy
+ − Votes (5)
April 27, 2016: House Transportation & Energy: . .SB16-157
April 27, 2016: House Transportation & Energy: . .SB16-157
April 27, 2016: House Transportation & Energy: . .SB16-157
March 17, 2016: Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: . .SB16-157
March 17, 2016: Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: . .SB16-157
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor