+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 13, 2024 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 12, 2024 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 12, 2024 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 11, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 11, 2024 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 8, 2024 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On March 6, 2024 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 4, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
On March 4, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 1, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On February 28, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 13, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs