+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 03/27/2014 - No Amendments
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
+ − Votes (2)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor