+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Reconsider
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Consideration of Second Conference Committee Report result was to Recede
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Rerevised w/ Amendments
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Amended to Appropriations
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Appropriations
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (12)
April 19, 2013: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-155 to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 13-0.
March 8, 2013: Senate Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Consent Calendar The motion passed without objection.
February 20, 2013: Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment E). The motion passed without objection.
February 20, 2013: Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment D). The motion passed without objection.
February 20, 2013: Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C). The motion passed without objection.
February 20, 2013: Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment F). The motion passed without objection.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor