+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 21, 2014 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations