+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 25, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 11, 2022 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On May 10, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On May 9, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 26, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 22, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services
On April 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On April 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
On March 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services