+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 14, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy