+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 11, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 30, 2018 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 27, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Reconsider to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs