+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
April 19, 2013: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-150 to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 13-0.
March 1, 2013: Senate Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Consent Calendar The motion passed without objection.
February 14, 2013: Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L. 001 (Attachment C), as amended. The motion passed without objection.
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor