+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On January 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor