+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On April 28, 2014 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Education
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (7)
April 25, 2014: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-015, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 11-2.
April 23, 2014: House Education: FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-015 to the Committee on Appropriations. The motion passed on a vote of 12-1.
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor