+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
- Sent to the Governor
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Rerevised w/ Amendments
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Legislative Council Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Legislative Council
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Education
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services