+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations