+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor Became Law
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Finance
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services