+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to Appropriations
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to Finance
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government