+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 16, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 7, 2018 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 4, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 20, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor