+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
March 17, 2016: Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: . .SB16-145
March 17, 2016: Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: . .SB16-145
March 17, 2016: Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: . .SB16-145
March 17, 2016: Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: . .SB16-145
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor