+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 10, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On April 29, 2022 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 28, 2022 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 27, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On April 26, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 21, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
- Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments
- Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy