+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor Action - Signed
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Education
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
+ − Votes (4)
February 11, 2013: Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-143 to the Committee on Finance. The motion passed on a vote of 4-0.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor