+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations
- House Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily with Amendments - Floor
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
April 17, 2015: Senate Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 The motion failed on a vote of 3-4.
April 17, 2015: Senate Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-141, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 4-3.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor