+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (16)
On July 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On June 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On June 13, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On June 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On June 11, 2020 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On June 3, 2020 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On June 1, 2020 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 28, 2020 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over to 06/01/2020 - No Amendments
On March 14, 2020 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/30/2020 - No Amendments
On March 13, 2020 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor