+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
February 23, 2016: House Business Affairs and Labor: . .SB16-014
February 23, 2016: House Business Affairs and Labor: . .SB16-014
January 20, 2016: Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: . .SB16-014
January 20, 2016: Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: . .SB16-014
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor