+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
May 1, 2015: House Appropriations: . .SB15-014
April 10, 2015: Senate Appropriations: . .SB15-014
April 10, 2015: Senate Appropriations: . .SB15-014
April 10, 2015: Senate Appropriations: . .SB15-014
February 26, 2015: Senate Health & Human Services: . .SB15-014
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor