+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Health, Insurance & Environment Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance & Environment
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor