+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Vote to Override Lost
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor Vetoed
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Pass
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Reconsider
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over to 04/03/2017 - No Amendments
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance