+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Education
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Education
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary + Education