+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
- Sent to the Governor
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 21, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor