+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance
- House Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/24/2015 - No Amendments
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/20/2015 - No Amendments
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/14/2015 - No Amendments
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/10/2015 - No Amendments
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/06/2015 - No Amendments
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/30/2015 - No Amendments
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/20/2015 - No Amendments
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/13/2015 - No Amendments
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/06/2015 - No Amendments
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 02/27/2015 - No Amendments
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 02/20/2015 - No Amendments
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government