+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor Action - Signed
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations
+ − Votes (2)
February 15, 2013: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 11-2.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor