+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Postpone Indefinitely
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
April 23, 2015: House Business Affairs and Labor: FINAL VOTE - Postpone Senate Bill 15-133 indefinitely. The motion passed on a vote of 7-6.
April 10, 2015: Senate Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-133 to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 6-1.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor