+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 16, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor