+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Sent to the Governor
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Education
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Education
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education