+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (15)
On July 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On June 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On June 19, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On June 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On June 8, 2020 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On June 5, 2020 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On June 4, 2020 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On June 1, 2020 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On May 28, 2020 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over to 06/01/2020 - No Amendments
On May 26, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary