+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/23/2015 - No Amendments
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/19/2015 - No Amendments
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (9)
April 16, 2015: House Judiciary: FINAL VOTE - Postpone Senate Bill 15-129 indefinitely. The motion passed on a vote of 9-4.
March 13, 2015: Senate Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-129, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 4-3.
March 13, 2015: Senate Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection.
February 11, 2015: Senate Judiciary: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (attachment H). The motion passed on a vote of 3-2.
February 11, 2015: Senate Judiciary: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (attachment E). The motion passed on a vote of 3-2.
February 11, 2015: Senate Judiciary: FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-129, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. The motion passed on a vote of 3-2.
February 11, 2015: Senate Judiciary: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (attachment G). The motion passed without objection.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor