+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology