+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/20/2017 - No Amendments
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Finance
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary + Finance
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor