+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (9)
April 30, 2015: House Judiciary: FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-124, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. The motion passed on a vote of 12-0.
April 30, 2015: House Judiciary: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment E). The motion passed without objection.
April 30, 2015: House Judiciary: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.008 (Attachment F). The motion passed without objection.
April 17, 2015: Senate Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-124, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 7-0.
April 17, 2015: Senate Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.004 The motion passed without objection.
February 11, 2015: Senate Judiciary: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (attachment C). The motion passed without objection.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor