+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
- Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services