+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
- Sent to the Governor
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Finance
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (14)
May 2, 2013: House Finance: FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.016 (Attachment B). The motion passed on a vote of 7-5.
April 30, 2013: House Judiciary: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment D). The motion passed without objection.
April 30, 2013: House Judiciary: FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-123, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. The motion passed on a vote of 7-4.
April 30, 2013: House Judiciary: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.013 (Attachment B). The motion passed on a vote of 10-1.
April 30, 2013: House Judiciary: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.015 (Attachment E). The motion passed without objection.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor