+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor