+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources + Appropriations
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy
+ − Votes (4)
March 18, 2015: House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: . .SB15-121
February 20, 2015: Senate Appropriations: . .SB15-121
February 5, 2015: Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: . .SB15-121
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor